U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04024
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Chhetri
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 26, 2018: [Stipulation]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Discovery Report]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • March 06, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 24, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 21, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 21, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 21, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 21, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.