U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04023
  • Case Name: Logistics Buddy LLC v. Windwalker Transportation, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 26, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [Protective Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • March 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 30, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 29, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 09, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • March 09, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 09, 2017: [Letter]
  • March 08, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 21, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 21, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 21, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 21, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.