U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-30050-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Khamdyrath et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 08, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 08, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2020: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • April 13, 2020: [Release from Custody]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 13, 2020: [Furlough]
  • March 11, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 12, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 12, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 07, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 31, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 01, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 11, 2019: [Furlough]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 16, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [USCA Order]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 31, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 13, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Request for Early Termination]
  • October 24, 2017: [Request for Early Termination]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 11, 2017: [Transcript]
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 03, 2017: [Transcript]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • July 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 27, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 27, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • July 26, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 24, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 20, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 01, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2017: [Release from Custody]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 24, 2017: [Extend]
  • April 21, 2017: [Extend]
  • April 14, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 15, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 22, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.