U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50025
  • Case Name: Ann Louise Teevens-Hill
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
December, 2017
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2017
  • April 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • March 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • February 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • February 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • February 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • February 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.