U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruedas-Jacinto
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • April 17, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 10, 2017: [Discovery]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 23, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 22, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • February 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.