U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Legarda-Oroz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 05, 2017: [Interpreter No Longer Needed]
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 21, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 28, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 28, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 31, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 28, 2017: [Request]
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 24, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 24, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.