U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 25, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 04, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 14, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 13, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 13, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 01, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 29, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 25, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 25, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 20, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • June 15, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 29, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 22, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [Request]
  • May 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 27, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2018: [Arrest]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 22, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.