U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vance
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 11, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 05, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 14, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 09, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 08, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Furlough]
  • March 07, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 03, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 03, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 03, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 03, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 23, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.