U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brunson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 14, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 17, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 23, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.