U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Juhala
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Mail Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Supplement]
  • October 27, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2021: [Response]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 19, 2021: [Extend]
  • October 04, 2021: [Supplement]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • September 21, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • September 20, 2021: [Admission]
  • September 20, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 06, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 29, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2018: [Evaluation]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 17, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 18, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 07, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Waiver]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2017: [Request]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2017: [Arrest]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • February 23, 2017: [Indictment]
  • February 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.