U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-10040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beisch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Supplement]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Answer of Garnishee]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • May 20, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • May 20, 2020: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.