U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04025
  • Case Name: Soholt et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Judgment - Consent]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 03, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 06, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Service]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 23, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 23, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.