U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 09, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 07, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 18, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 05, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 05, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 24, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 08, 2021: [Release from Custody]
  • September 03, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 01, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • August 24, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 23, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 28, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 05, 2018: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 27, 2017: [Passport - Return of]
  • November 27, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 20, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 15, 2017: [Transcript]
  • November 08, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 02, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 25, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 25, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 11, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 01, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Transcript]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 23, 2017: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • August 23, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 23, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • August 22, 2017: [Dismiss Count]
  • August 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 18, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 16, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 15, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • August 15, 2017: [Jury List]
  • August 11, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice]
  • August 11, 2017: [Witness List]
  • August 09, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • August 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 08, 2017: [In Limine]
  • August 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • July 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 25, 2017: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • July 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 18, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 18, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 17, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • July 14, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 14, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • July 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 12, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 07, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 07, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2017: [Admission]
  • April 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • April 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 11, 2017: [Request]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [Arrest]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 05, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Request]
  • April 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 24, 2017: [Disclosure ]
  • February 23, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 23, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 23, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2017: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.