U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05085
  • Case Name: Webb v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • May 08, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 07, 2018: [Objection]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 23, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 05, 2017: [Response]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 06, 2017: [Reverse]
  • March 06, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.