U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-01057
  • Case Name: El Karmassi v. Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
  • August 21, 2019: [Letter Received]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • December 20, 2017: [Letter Received]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Judgment of Dismissal (Clerk)]
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2017: [Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Continue]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 19, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.