U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 11-50241
  • Case Name: David Alan Rempel and Patti Kae Rempel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hardship Discharge]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Status Report]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Status Conference]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certification of Financial Management Course]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.