U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40051
  • Case Name: Elizabeth Katherine Bailey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (debtor) (text entry only)]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
April, 2017
  • April 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • February 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • February 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • February 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • February 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.