U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04026
  • Case Name: Johnson v. State of South Dakota et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 17, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • May 17, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 09, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • February 24, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 24, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.