U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-01040
  • Case Name: Koeck v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Costs Taxed]
  • November 14, 2017: [Response]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 30, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 30, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • October 19, 2017: [Received]
  • October 05, 2017: [Judgment of Dismissal (Clerk)]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 13, 2017: [Response]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 27, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.