U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mamola et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 03, 2023: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 01, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 29, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 21, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2018: [Waiver]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 26, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 23, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2018: [Consent]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 25, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 25, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 25, 2017: [Waiver]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 16, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 16, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 16, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 14, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 29, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 28, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • June 27, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 26, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 18, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 02, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 09, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Request]
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 28, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 28, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 28, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 27, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.