U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40053
  • Case Name: Johnnie Thomas Lassiter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • October 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
September, 2019
  • September 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.