U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04027
  • Case Name: Burgess et al v. City of Sioux Falls et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Reply]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2017: [Received]
  • September 01, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 01, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 01, 2017: [Brief]
  • September 01, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • September 01, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Discovery Report]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 03, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • February 27, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 27, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 27, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 27, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 27, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.