U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-04003
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Schmidt, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 06, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 03, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • April 20, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • March 07, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 28, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • February 28, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • February 28, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.