U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weber
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 10, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Transcript Redaction Request]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 12, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 08, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 07, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 07, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 07, 2020: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • May 07, 2020: [Transcript]
  • May 04, 2020: [USCA Order]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Order]
  • April 07, 2020: [Proposed Order]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Response]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 25, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 13, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 10, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 06, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • January 13, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Objection]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 27, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • September 27, 2019: [Verdict]
  • September 27, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • September 27, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • September 27, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 27, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 26, 2019: [Dismiss Count]
  • September 25, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 24, 2019: [In Limine]
  • September 24, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 24, 2019: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • September 24, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 24, 2019: [Jury List]
  • September 23, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • September 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 19, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 19, 2019: [Subpoena(s)]
  • September 18, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 17, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 16, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 13, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 13, 2019: [Dismiss Count]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 09, 2019: [Trial Brief ]
  • September 09, 2019: [Strike ]
  • September 06, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 06, 2019: [Supplement]
  • September 06, 2019: [In Limine]
  • September 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Objection]
  • August 22, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 21, 2019: [Brief]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 02, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2019: [Disclosure ]
  • January 25, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • January 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 18, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 10, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 23, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 09, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Transcript - Redacted]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Reply]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Extend]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 04, 2018: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 04, 2018: [Transcript]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Exhibit List]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 25, 2017: [Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • July 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [Extend]
  • July 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 03, 2017: [Extend]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 22, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 22, 2017: [Extend]
  • June 19, 2017: [Suppress]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Subpoena(s)]
  • May 24, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 13, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 09, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 06, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 28, 2017: [Arrest]
  • February 28, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.