U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04159
  • Case Name: Wellman v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 01, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 16, 2018: [Costs Taxed]
  • January 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 18, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 18, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 29, 2017: [Reverse]
  • May 12, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 28, 2017: [Transcript of Social Security Admin Hrg Received]
  • February 28, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.