U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04158
  • Case Name: Brinkman v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • September 05, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 12, 2017: [Costs Taxed]
  • July 11, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • July 07, 2017: [Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • June 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 27, 2017: [Remand to Agency]
May, 2017
  • May 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 29, 2017: [Reverse]
  • May 11, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 28, 2017: [Transcript of Social Security Admin Hrg Received]
  • February 28, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.