U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05014
  • Case Name: Robeson v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Transcript of Social Security Admin Hrg Received]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Discovery Report]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • March 27, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 09, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Service]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 28, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 28, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 28, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.