U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10021
  • Case Name: Rikki Rochelle Leinen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Vacating Order (Text Order)]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • March 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • March 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • March 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.