U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cross Dog
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 09, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 14, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 14, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 15, 2017: [Extend]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 09, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 09, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2017: [Waiver]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 18, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 18, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 07, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 06, 2017: [Request]
  • March 03, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 03, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 03, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 03, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 03, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 03, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.