U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sierra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 16, 2019: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 01, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 23, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 07, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 26, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 26, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 09, 2017: [Request]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 03, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 03, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 03, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 03, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 03, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.