U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-04004
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Welsh
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
  • September 12, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • August 17, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • August 03, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • March 30, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 06, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 06, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • March 06, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • March 06, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.