U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Munoz-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 09, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 28, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 28, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 12, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 12, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 10, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 10, 2017: [Request]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 08, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • March 08, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 08, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 08, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.