U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nelson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 15, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 17, 2019: [Forfeiture]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Forfeiture]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 26, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • May 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • May 24, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 09, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 09, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 09, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 09, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Waiver]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 23, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 08, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.