U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Padilla
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 31, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 03, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 11, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 10, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 29, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 05, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 06, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 17, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice]
  • September 10, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 05, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 03, 2018: [Transcript]
  • September 03, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 28, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 03, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 29, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 10, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 10, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 25, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 25, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 24, 2017: [Brief]
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice]
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 08, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 08, 2017: [Redacted Indictment / Superseding Indictment for Service]
  • March 08, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.