U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burning Breast
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • August 25, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 19, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 11, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 11, 2022: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 13, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 10, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • March 09, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 08, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 07, 2022: [Consent]
  • March 07, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 07, 2022: [Ex Parte Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 06, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 21, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 21, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 21, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 20, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 20, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 14, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 05, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 05, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 09, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 27, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
May, 2018
  • May 28, 2018: [Forfeiture]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 17, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 27, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 21, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 09, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 19, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 19, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 19, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 19, 2017: [Extend]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 13, 2017: [Request]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 13, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2017: [Request]
  • March 09, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.