U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40068
  • Case Name: Robert Eugene Miller and Cheryl Gay Miller
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
March, 2022
  • March 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • March 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • March 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.