U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-30067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Running
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 04, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 29, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 26, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 26, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 12, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 15, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 14, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Transcript]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 09, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 07, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 26, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.