U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-30056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Provancial
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 28, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 08, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 06, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.