U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hatch-Pequin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • September 19, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • June 22, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Certificate]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 16, 2018: [Forfeiture]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 12, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 12, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 07, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 02, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 26, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 28, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 27, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • November 20, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 06, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 06, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 06, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2017: [Competency Report]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 24, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 24, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 06, 2017: [Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 30, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 30, 2017: [Seal Case]
  • June 30, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 30, 2017: [Competency Evaluation]
  • June 30, 2017: [Response]
  • June 29, 2017: [Furlough]
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2017: [Request]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 23, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 23, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 22, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • June 13, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 23, 2017: [Discovery]
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 12, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 12, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 12, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • May 11, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Warrant]
  • May 11, 2017: [Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • May 11, 2017: [Ex Parte Motion for Warrant]
  • May 10, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 18, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 17, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 10, 2017: [Reconsideration]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 16, 2017: [Request]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 13, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.