U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10029
  • Case Name: Darian Eugene Riter and Misty Dawn Riter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service of TFR (Used only by Ch 7 Trustee)]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation (Without Notice)]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • April 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Correcting Address (no fee)]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.