U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-05001
  • Case Name: The First National Bank of Gordon v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • April 12, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • April 11, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • March 14, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 13, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.