U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wenthold
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Brief]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Supplement]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 12, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 12, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 08, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 07, 2018: [Extend]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2018: [Extend]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Extend]
  • May 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 03, 2018: [Extend]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2017: [1 - Ex Parte Document]
  • August 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 18, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 17, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Request]
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 10, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 03, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 13, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.