U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baade
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Response]
  • December 29, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • December 20, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 23, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 27, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 28, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • June 08, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 07, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 12, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 12, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • January 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2018: [Objection]
  • January 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 29, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 28, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 28, 2017: [Leave to]
  • December 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 21, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 20, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • December 01, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 28, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 07, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • October 24, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 24, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 05, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • October 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 04, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 04, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • October 04, 2017: [Verdict]
  • October 04, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 04, 2017: [Response to Jury Question]
  • October 04, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • October 04, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 04, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 03, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 03, 2017: [Jury List]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order]
  • September 29, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 29, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 27, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • September 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 26, 2017: [Response]
  • September 26, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 26, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 26, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 26, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 26, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice]
  • September 25, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 21, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 15, 2017: [Unseal Case]
  • August 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 05, 2017: [Discovery]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 17, 2017: [Discovery]
  • April 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 14, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 14, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 14, 2017: [Response]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2017: [Request]
  • April 11, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 10, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • April 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 04, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • April 04, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 30, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 30, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 24, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Request]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 15, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 13, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.