U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40076
  • Case Name: Michael Allen Watson and Sonja Corrine Watson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
  • September 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Final Report and Account (Ch 12)]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 12 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Service of Final Form]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
  • April 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
February, 2022
  • February 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • February 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • January 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • January 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 04, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 04, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
July, 2021
  • July 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • June 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • May 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2019
  • January 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
June, 2018
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • May 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Claim]
  • March 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • November 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reject Lease or Executory Contract]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reject Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • August 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement under Rule 9019 (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • June 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • June 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • May 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • May 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
  • May 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amend Order]
  • May 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amend Order (No Notice Required)]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Deadlines]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief from Automatic Stay]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • March 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • March 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • March 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • March 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • March 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.