U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 09-40222
  • Case Name: Dennis LeeRoy Nisbet
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Substitute Redacted Document]
  • March 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
  • March 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • March 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Substitute Redacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.