U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Witt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 24, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • August 24, 2017: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • August 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 24, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • August 24, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • August 24, 2017: [Verdict]
  • August 24, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 24, 2017: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • August 23, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 23, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • August 23, 2017: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • August 23, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 23, 2017: [Jury List]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 22, 2017: [In Limine]
  • August 21, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 17, 2017: [Witness List]
  • August 17, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 17, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 17, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 16, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 15, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 15, 2017: [Witness List]
  • August 14, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 14, 2017: [In Limine]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 08, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice]
  • August 07, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 03, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 16, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2017: [Arrest]
  • April 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2017: [Request]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Redacted Indictment / Superseding Indictment for Service]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.