U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Agard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 04, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 04, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 12, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 11, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 11, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 11, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 22, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 22, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2018: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 04, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Letter]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 06, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2017: [Request]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2017: [Request]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2017: [Furlough]
  • April 10, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 05, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 05, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2017: [Request]
  • March 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.