U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 13, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 19, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 18, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 14, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • June 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 23, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [Response]
  • May 19, 2017: [Letter]
  • May 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 18, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 11, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • May 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 30, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 23, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Request]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 21, 2017: [Request]
  • March 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.