U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spotted Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • September 11, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 11, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 03, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 13, 2020: [Response]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 02, 2020: [Extend]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Supplement]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 09, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • June 01, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Receipt]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 29, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Redact Transcript]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 23, 2018: [Transcript]
  • February 08, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 07, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • February 07, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • February 07, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 17, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 29, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 29, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • December 22, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 22, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 21, 2017: [Dismiss Count]
  • December 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 09, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 09, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 09, 2017: [Verdict]
  • November 09, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 09, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • November 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 06, 2017: [Jury List]
  • November 03, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 03, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 03, 2017: [Witness List]
  • November 02, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2017: [Response]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 24, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 23, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 20, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 29, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 29, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice]
  • September 27, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 27, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 15, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 15, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 15, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 30, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 29, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Request]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Request]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.