U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 30, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 04, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 08, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 08, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 23, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 01, 2017: [Request]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order]
  • May 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 25, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 24, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 24, 2017: [Request]
  • May 23, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2017: [Arrest]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.